WY HB0090 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mineral leases; requiring notice to private surface owners and private subsurface owners and mineral lessees of proposed lease sales involving state lands; requiring notice to subsurface owners and mineral lessees of proposed state land sales or trades; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State lands-notice of lease sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | COW:S Did not consider for COW |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-03-04 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-17 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 53-6-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-03 | Bill Number Assigned |