WY HB0083 | 2010 | Budget Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes and offenses; prohibiting adult sex offenders from access to school properties and events as specified; providing exceptions; providing penalties; requiring posting of notices as specified; providing definitions; amending a definition; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses-restrictions for adult sex offenders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-03 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-09 Assigned Chapter Number
2010-03-09 Governor Signed HEA No. 0063
2010-03-05 (S) President Signed HEA No. 0063
2010-03-05 (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0063
2010-03-05 Assigned Number HEA No. 0063
2010-03-05 (H) Adopted HB0083JC01
2010-03-04 (S) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-03 (H) Appointed JCC01 Members
2010-03-03 (H) Did Not Concur
2010-03-03 (H) Received for Concurrence
2010-03-03 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-03-02 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-03-01 (S) Passed CoW
2010-02-26 (S) Placed on General File
2010-02-26 (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2010-02-23 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2010-02-22 (S) Received for Introduction
2010-02-22 (H) Passed 3rd Reading
2010-02-22 (H) Advanced to 3rd Reading on Same Day
2010-02-22 (H) Passed 2nd Reading
2010-02-19 (H) Passed CoW
2010-02-17 (H) Placed on General File
2010-02-17 (H01) Recommended Do Pass
2010-02-10 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2010-02-09 (H) Received for Introduction
2010-02-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback