WY HB0081 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development projects; authorizing specified level I and level II studies; providing appropriations; requiring reports; providing for reversion of unexpended funds; authorizing unobligated funds to be used to complete other designated projects as specified; providing for groundwater studies funding; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus water bill-planning.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 105 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0038 | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2019-02-19 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0038 |
2019-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0038 | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-02-04 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 |
2019-02-01 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-0-4-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-17 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-01-16 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-01-16 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-15 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-01-15 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2019-01-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |