WY HB0079 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 64
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; providing that a concealed carry permit is acceptable identification for purposes of in-person voter identification requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Voter I.D. requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Art Washut [R] | Sen. Eric Barlow [R] |
Sen. Lynn Hutchings [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 64 | |
2023-02-21 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0025 | |
2023-02-16 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2023-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0025 |
2023-02-15 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0025 | |
2023-02-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-09 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-07 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-24 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |