WY HB0078 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to parental rights; specifying applicability of parental rights protections; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Protection of parental rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Haroldson [R] | Rep. Chip Neiman [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] |
Rep. Cody Wylie [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] | Sen. Cheri Steinmetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-04 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2023/HB0078 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Introduced/HB0078.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2023/Fiscal/HB0078.pdf |