WY HB0078 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to employment; allowing firearms to be stored in a motor vehicle located in an employer's motor vehicle parking area; providing exemptions and immunity; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms in private vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseCOW:H Did not consider for COW
2020-02-20HousePlaced on General File
2020-02-20HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2020-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-2-1-0-0
2020-02-07HouseReceived for Introduction
2020-01-29 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback