WY HB0071 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 80
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to driver's licenses; amending enhancement provision for subsequent violations of driving while license cancelled, suspended or revoked to include similar laws of other jurisdictions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Driving while license suspended-enhancement amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 80 | |
2022-03-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0043 | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0043 |
2022-03-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0043 | |
2022-03-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-07 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-04 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-5-1-0-0 |
2022-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-22 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary 57-2-1-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-07 | Bill Number Assigned |