WY HB0071 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to legal time; requiring the state to observe a time zone as specified; establishing a new uniform state time; repealing provisions; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Mountain standard time.
Sponsors
Rep. John Bear [R] | Rep. Marshall Burt [L] | Rep. Bill Fortner [R] | Rep. Chip Neiman [R] |
Rep. Pepper Ottman [R] | Sen. Troy McKeown [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - House - COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | COW:Failed 24-31-5-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2021-01-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-19 | Bill Number Assigned |