WY HB0070 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; requiring physicians to provide patients with specified information before nonemergency abortion procedures; amending disciplinary grounds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Abortion-informed consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2021-01-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |