WY HB0068 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Statutory Foundation Act; amending definitions; amending provisions related to beneficiaries, liabilities, obligations, debts and distributions under the act; making conforming amendments; authorizing the issuance of units and shares of a statutory foundation; repealing definitions and provisions related to foundation purposes, beneficiaries and the liability of protectors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Statutory Foundation Act-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Concur:Passed 49-0-11-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 98 | |
2021-04-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0054 | |
2021-04-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2021-03-31 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0054 |
2021-03-30 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0054 | |
2021-03-30 | House | Concur:Passed 49-0-11-0-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2021-03-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-23 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-03 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-01 | House | H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-01-21 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |