WY HB0067 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-23 - Did Not Consider in CoW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; providing for general election contributions to political candidates not participating in primary elections to occur before a primary election; modifying requirements for filing campaign reports as specified; requiring the filing of campaign reports relating to electioneering communications; amending campaign advertising provisions; repealing provisions relating to political speech by certain organizations; repealing archaic language; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Campaign finance revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | Did Not Consider in CoW |
2018-02-23 | House | COW |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 53-6-1-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |