WY HB0062 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Wyoming Controlled Substances Act; conforming punctuation and spelling in the act to terminology in federal law; adding and deleting substances in the various schedules of the act as specified; amending registration requirements as specified; amending methamphetamine precursor sales restrictions to match federal requirements; authorizing a person to sign a consent for a third party to receive prescription tracking reports; specifying applicability of new registration requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Controlled Substances Act-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - H Did Concur (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-19 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-18 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0024 | |
2011-02-16 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0024 | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0024 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0024 | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Did Concur | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-04 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-04 | (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-19 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-19 | (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2011-01-11 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |