WY HB0061 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-23 - 3rd Reading:Failed 3-54-3-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to business entities; specifying that a series limited liability company may be named or designated in any manner; requiring registered agents to maintain series naming or designation information; prohibiting the adoption of rules relating to series naming or designation requirements and filing requirements; imposing a fee for series limited liability companies as specified; requiring the repeal of specified rules; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Series LLCs-naming and fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 3-54-3-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-23House3rd Reading:Failed 3-54-3-0-0
2019-01-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-01-18House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-17HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-16HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-16HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2019-01-14House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-01-14HouseH03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-31 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback