WY HB0060 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Uniform Prudent Management of Institutional Funds Act; amending provisions related to amount of authorized expenditures as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
UPMIFA-expenditure limitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - S09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-08 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-03 | (S) President Signed HEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Speaker Signed HEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0027 | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-24 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-24 | (S09) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S09 | |
2010-02-23 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Advanced to 3rd Reading on Same Day | |
2010-02-22 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-19 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-17 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-17 | (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H09 | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-04 | Bill Number Assigned |