WY HB0058 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 200 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Chapter No. 200 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school facility projects; modifying appropriations for school facility projects for the biennial budget period July 1, 2016 through June 30, 2018; transferring funds; making conforming amendments; requiring reporting; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School facilities appropriations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0058JC001: 23-5-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0058JC001: 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0058JC001: 25-35-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - House - Concur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0058JC001: 23-5-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0058JC001: 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0058JC001: 25-35-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - House - Concur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0058JC001: 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0058JC001: 25-35-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - House - Concur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Adopted HB0058JC001: 23-5-2-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0058JC001: 36-22-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - Did Not Adopt HB0058JC001: 25-35-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-03 - House - Concur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Laid Back (Y: 12 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Chapter No. 200 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-14 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0124 | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0124 |
2017-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0124 |
2017-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0124 | |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Adopted HB0058JC001: 23-5-2-0-0 |
2017-03-03 | House | Adopted HB0058JC001: 36-22-2-0-0 |
2017-03-03 | Rescind original vote pursuant to HR 12-11 41-17-2-0-0 | |
2017-03-03 | Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members | |
2017-03-03 | House | Did Not Adopt HB0058JC001: 25-35-0-0-0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-03-03 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2017-03-03 | House | Concur:Failed 4-56-0-0-0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-0-0-0 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2017-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-30 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 |
2017-01-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-24 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-11 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-28 | Bill Number Assigned |