WY HB0053 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - 3rd Reading:Recommit to S04 - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - 3rd Reading:Recommit to S04 - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; amending the state's educational program relating to computer science and world cultures and languages; providing that computer science courses may satisfy certain high school graduation requirements and certain Hathaway scholarship requirements; providing applicability; requiring a report; and providing for effective dates.
Title
State educational program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 58-2-0-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Recommit to S04 - Education |
2018-03-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-03-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-03-06 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-27 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-17-4-0-0 |
2018-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-02-20 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-19 | House | H04 - Education:Rerefer to H02- Appropriations |
2018-02-19 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education 58-2-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |