WY HB0050 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to state lands; requiring legislative review of state land exchanges and sales under specified conditions; establishing review procedures; amending standards relating to surface and mineral rights for land transfers; requiring public hearings as specified; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative review of state land transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-18 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Housepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-18HouseH05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback