WY HB0050 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to appropriations for the legislature; providing appropriations for the operation of the legislative branch of state government; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation for the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - Concur:Passed 45-13-2-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - Introduced and Referred to H12 - Rules 58-0-2-0-0 (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 79 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed HEA No. 0048
2016-03-03SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0048
2016-03-03HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0048
2016-03-03 Assigned Number HEA No. 0048
2016-03-02HouseConcur:Passed 45-13-2-0-0
2016-03-02HouseReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
2016-03-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-26SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 S12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S12 - Rules
2016-02-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-23House3rd Reading:Passed 53-7-0-0-0
2016-02-22House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-19House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2016-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-17HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 H12 - Rules:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 12-0-1-0-0
2016-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H12 - Rules 58-0-2-0-0
2016-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-01-26 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback