WY HB0044 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; imposing a tax on prepaid wireless communications access; providing for collection and distribution of the tax; granting rulemaking authority; requiring reporting; amending reporting provisions; updating obsolete language; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Emergency 911 fees-prepaid wireless.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Concur:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 90 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0063 | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0063 |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0063 |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0063 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Concur:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-20 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-19 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-17 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-1-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 |
2015-01-30 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-28 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-20 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-20 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-02 | Bill Number Assigned |