WY HB0040 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-14 - COW:Failed 27-29-4-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to defense forces and affairs; clarifying the Wyoming military code's application to servicemembers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military code jurisdiction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - House - COW:Failed 27-29-4-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2019-01-11 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-14HouseCOW:Failed 27-29-4-0-0
2019-01-11HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-11HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-27 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback