WY HB0039 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; authorizing the department of transportation to accept specified documentation to verify honorable discharge of a veteran for the veteran designation on a Wyoming driver's license; amending the veteran designation on a Wyoming driver's license; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Verifying the veteran designation on a WY driver's license.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 11 | |
2023-02-15 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0006 | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0006 |
2023-02-13 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0006 |
2023-02-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0006 | |
2023-02-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-07 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-2-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-01-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-01-13 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-01-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-12 | Bill Number Assigned |