WY HB0038 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 160 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; amending Wyoming's political action committee campaign contribution limits as specified; allowing organizations to bear PAC related costs as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAC-campaign limits and funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0038JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted HB0038JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted HB0038JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0038JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - Adopted HB0038JC001: 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Concur:Failed 20-39-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - House - Concur:Failed 20-39-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - House - Concur:Failed 20-39-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0 (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0 (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-15 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 160 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed HEA No. 0102
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0102
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0102
2015-03-04 Assigned Number HEA No. 0102
2015-03-04SenateAdopted HB0038JC001: 27-2-1-0-0
2015-03-03HouseAdopted HB0038JC001: 52-7-1-0-0
2015-02-27SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-25HouseConcur:Failed 20-39-1-0-0
2015-02-24HouseReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 16-14-0-0-0
2015-02-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-20SenateCOW Passed
2015-02-19SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-19 Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2015-01-22SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-19House3rd Reading:Passed 45-15-0-0-0
2015-01-16House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-15HouseCOW Passed
2015-01-15HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-15 Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2015-01-13HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-02 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback