WY HB0036 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to food and drugs; increasing the pesticide registration fee; specifying distribution and use of the fee; providing for a continuous appropriation; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pesticide registration fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 3 | |
2020-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0010 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0010 |
2020-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0010 |
2020-03-03 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0010 | |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-26 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 50-9-1-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-01-07 | Bill Number Assigned |