WY HB0035 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to boards, commissions or other bodies; requiring appointed members to notify the governor when the member fails to meet or maintain qualifications as specified; providing for removal for failing to meet or maintain qualifications as specified; providing for the governor to fill vacancies as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boards and commissions-removal of appointed members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-03 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03 S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0
2015-03-03SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
2015-01-27SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-27House3rd Reading:Passed 49-11-0-0-0
2015-01-26House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-23HouseCOW:Passed
2015-01-22HousePlaced on General File
2015-01-22 Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-01-14HouseIntroduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
2015-01-13HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-02 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback