WY HB0033 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter No. 7 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter No. 7 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gasoline taxes; amending the amount attributable to nonresident motorboats for computations for distribution to the department of state parks and cultural resources as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Nonresident motorboats-gasoline tax distribution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-1-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Chapter No. 7 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0008 | |
2017-02-10 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0008 |
2017-02-10 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0008 |
2017-02-09 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0008 | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-02 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-23-1-0-0 |
2017-01-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-18 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 4-3-0-0-0 |
2017-01-16 | House | Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2017-01-16 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-13 | Bill Number Assigned |