WY HB0027 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-21 - Did Not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to constitutional conventions; providing limits on the authority of delegates to a constitutional convention as specified; providing for penalties; providing for rules and regulations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Article V constitutional convention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - H Introduced and Referred to H09 (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | House | Did Not Consider in COW |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-19 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2014-02-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0027.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/HB0027.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/HB0027.htm |