WY HB0017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter No. 1 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Chapter No. 1 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to adult protective services; extending the permissible period for emergency services; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Adult protective orders-time limit extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-0-3-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | Chapter No. 1 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-02-14 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-02-14 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0002 | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2017-02-09 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0002 |
2017-02-08 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0002 | |
2017-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-0-3-0-0 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-02-01 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0 |
2017-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-01-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-01-13 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2017-01-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2016-12-08 | Bill Number Assigned |