WY HB0015 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; providing for contracting operations of a golf course without the transfer of an associated liquor license held by the political subdivision; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Political subdivision club liquor licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-0-2-0-3 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-0-0-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-0-0-2 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 30 | |
2022-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0026 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0026 |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0026 |
2022-03-07 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0026 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 25-0-2-0-3 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-03 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-0-0-0-2 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-28 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 |
2022-02-25 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-24 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-22 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations 59-0-1-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2022-01-03 | Bill Number Assigned |