WY HB0015 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 194
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; revising notarization requirements for certificates of title and bills of sale for motor vehicles be notarized; specifying the manner in which interest is held in motor vehicles; modifying the form for bills of sale; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles-titles and bills of sale.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Adopted HB0015JC001: 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Adopted HB0015JC001: 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Concur:Failed 2-55-3-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0 (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 194
2019-03-08 Governor Signed HEA No. 0123
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed HEA No. 0123
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed HEA No. 0123
2019-02-27 Assigned Number HEA No. 0123
2019-02-25SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-25HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2019-02-25HouseConcur:Failed 2-55-3-0-0
2019-02-22HouseReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2019-02-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-12SenateS08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
2019-01-30SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-29House3rd Reading:Passed 38-21-1-0-0
2019-01-28House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-25HouseCOW:Passed
2019-01-18HousePlaced on General File
2019-01-18HouseH08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2019-01-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-12-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback