WY HB0013 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Assigned Chapter Number 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; exempting flow-through pools from the public pool and spa health and safety act; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Flow-through pools-exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Assigned Chapter Number 25 | |
2024-03-05 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0021 | |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0021 |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0021 |
2024-02-29 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0021 | |
2024-02-29 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-2-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-27 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-20 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture 61-0-1-0-0 |
2024-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-12-05 | Bill Number Assigned |