WY HB0011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to mine product taxes; providing an exemption on taxes for the production of crude oil and natural gas as specified; requiring reports; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Oil and gas production tax exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2021-03-23 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals |
2021-01-12 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-12-16 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.wyoleg.gov/Legislation/2021/HB0011 |
Text | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Introduced/HB0011.pdf |
Supplement | https://www.wyoleg.gov/2021/Fiscal/HB0011.pdf |