WY HB0007 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to commercial vehicles; amending offenses that disqualify a person for life from driving a commercial vehicle; amending rulemaking requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Commercial vehicle driving disqualification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 57-2-1-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 45 | |
2022-03-09 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0012 | |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0012 |
2022-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0012 |
2022-03-04 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0012 | |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2022-03-01 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-17 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2022-02-15 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2022-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |