WY HB0003 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 13 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Chapter No. 13 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to insurance; applying penalty provisions to persons who instruct others to violate the law as specified; increasing civil penalties and aggregate limits which can be assessed by the insurance commissioner; allowing the insurance commissioner to collect the costs of investigatory and administrative proceedings; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Department of insurance-fine schedules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-14 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0 (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-01-14 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-14 - House - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | Chapter No. 13 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-02-25 | Governor Signed HEA No. 0009 | |
2015-02-20 | Senate | President Signed HEA No. 0009 |
2015-02-20 | House | Speaker Signed HEA No. 0009 |
2015-02-12 | Assigned Number HEA No. 0009 | |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-10 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-19 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0 |
2015-01-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-01-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-01-14 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-12-01 | Bill Number Assigned |