WV SCR61 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - Ordered to House
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-12 - Ordered to House
Summary
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study methods for assessing state's narrative water quality standards
Title
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study methods for assessing state's narrative water quality standards
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-12 | Ordered to House | |
2011-03-12 | Adopted by Senate with amended title | |
2011-03-12 | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-03-11 | Reported be adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Rules | |
2011-03-09 | Motion | |
2011-03-08 | Reported be adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Originating in Senate Natural Resources |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=61&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |