WV SCR6 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Holden 22 Coal Miners Memorial Bridge
Title
Holden 22 Coal Miners Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] |
Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] | Sen. Michael Romano [D] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 257) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-28 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-28 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 257) |
2022-02-28 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-02-28 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Be adopted |
2022-02-08 | House | To House Rules |
2022-02-08 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2022-01-21 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2022-01-21 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2022-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2022-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-13 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |