WV SCR6 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House Message received
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-08 - House Message received
Summary
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study Universal Voluntary Accounts Program
Title
Requesting Joint Committee on Government and Finance study Universal Voluntary Accounts Program
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-08 | House Message received | |
2008-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-08 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-03-08 | Adopted by House (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-08 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2008-03-08 | Be adopted | |
2008-03-05 | To House Rules | |
2008-03-05 | To Rules | |
2008-03-05 | Introduced in House | |
2008-03-05 | Ordered to House | |
2008-03-05 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2008-03-05 | On Unfinished Business | |
2008-03-04 | Reported be adopted | |
2008-02-20 | To Rules | |
2008-02-20 | Reported be adopted, but first to Rules | |
2008-01-11 | To Pensions | |
2008-01-11 | To Pensions then Rules | |
2008-01-11 | On Unfinished Business | |
2008-01-10 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-10 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2008&sessiontype=RS&input4=6&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |