WV SCR51 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name bridge in Man, Logan County, "Cox Joe Gollie Memorial Bridge"
Title
Requesting DOH name bridge in Man, Logan County, "Cox Joe Gollie Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-10 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-10 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2012-03-10 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2012-03-09 | Be adopted | |
2012-03-01 | To House Rules | |
2012-03-01 | To Rules | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in House | |
2012-03-01 | Ordered to House | |
2012-03-01 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-01 | On Unfinished Business | |
2012-02-29 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-02-27 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2012-02-27 | On Unfinished Business | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-24 | Filed for introduction |