WV SCR47 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending Joint Rules of Senate and House relating to printing enrolled bills
Title
Amending Joint Rules of Senate and House relating to printing enrolled bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2015-03-10 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-10 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | Be adopted |
2015-03-04 | House | To House Rules |
2015-03-04 | House | To Rules |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2015-02-28 | Senate | To Rules |
2015-02-28 | Senate | To Rules |
2015-02-28 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |