WV SCR30 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - House Message received
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - House Message received
Summary
Requesting DOH name bridge number 03-119-16.22 "PFC Willie Ray Stollings Memorial Bridge"
Title
Requesting DOH name bridge number 03-119-16.22 "PFC Willie Ray Stollings Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House Message received | |
2011-03-09 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-09 | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-09 | Reported by the Clerk | |
2011-03-09 | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Be adopted | |
2011-02-23 | To House Rules | |
2011-02-23 | To Rules | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-22 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-22 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-21 | Reported be adopted | |
2011-02-14 | To Transportation and Infrastructure | |
2011-02-14 | On Unfinished Business | |
2011-02-11 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-11 | Filed for introduction |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Resolution_History.cfm?year=2011&sessiontype=RS&input4=30&billtype=CR&houseorig=S&btype=res |