WV SCR29 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Nitro WW I Memorial Bridge
Title
Nitro WW I Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. Rupert Phillips [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-09 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2022-03-09 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Be adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | To House Rules |
2022-03-01 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2022-02-11 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-02-03 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-03 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |