WV SCR29 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name bridge in Kanawha County "Rosie the Riveter Memorial Bridge"
Title
Requesting DOH name bridge in Kanawha County "Rosie the Riveter Memorial Bridge"
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Palumbo [D] | Sen. Donna Boley [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Tom Takubo [R] |
Sen. Chris Walters [R] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Roman Prezioso [D] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-12 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-12 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Be adopted |
2015-03-10 | House | To House Rules |
2015-03-10 | House | Be adopted, but first to Rules |
2015-03-05 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2015-03-05 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2015-03-05 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2015-02-17 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-17 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-02-17 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |