WV SCR28 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
US Army SPC4 Randall W. Arbogast Memorial Road
Title
US Army SPC4 Randall W. Arbogast Memorial Road
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and adopted resolution |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2017-04-06 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2017-04-05 | House | Be adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | To House Rules |
2017-03-28 | House | With amendment, be adopted, but first to Rules |
2017-03-16 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-03-16 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Rules |
2017-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2017-03-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-09 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |