WV SCR22 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting DOH name I-81 overpass "Deputy John L. Burkett III Memorial Overpass"
Title
Requesting DOH name section of Rt. 901 "Deputy John L. Burkett III Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment and adopted resolution |
2014-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-03 | House | Adopted by House, Daily Calendar (Voice vote) |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-03 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2014-03-03 | House | On Unfinished Business, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-28 | House | With amendment, be adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | To House Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | To Rules |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2014-01-31 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |