WV SCR17 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on January 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-4)
Status: Passed on January 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - House Message received
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reaffirming support of WV Legislature for State of Israel and Jewish people
Title
Reaffirming support of WV Legislature for State of Israel and Jewish people
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - House - Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 23) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 36) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 36) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-01-24 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-01-24 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Roll No. 23) |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2024-01-24 | House | On Unfinished Business, Special Calendar |
2024-01-23 | House | Be adopted |
2024-01-17 | House | To House Rules |
2024-01-17 | House | To Rules |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Roll No. 36) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2024-01-16 | Senate | On Unfinished Business |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |