WV SB844 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the name of the "Educational Broadcasting Authority" to the "Educational Broadcasting Commission" and to make technical corrections.
Title
Redesignating Educational Broadcasting Authority as Educational Broadcasting Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 511) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 510) (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 229) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 511) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 510) (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 229) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 146, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/11/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 402) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House changed effective date |
2024-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | House requests Senate to concur in changed effective date |
2024-03-06 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 511) |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 510) |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-26 | House | To House Government Organization |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 229) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |