WV SB837 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 78, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 78, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize Public Defender Corporations until July 1, 2025 to reorganize its offices to conform the circuit reconfiguration enacted during the 2023 Regular Session of the Legislature.
Title
Reorganizing offices of Public Defender Corporations to conform to circuit reconfiguration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 714) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 713) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 302) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 302) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 713) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 302) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 302) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 78, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/13/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/13/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/13/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/12/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 714) |
2024-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 713) |
2024-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 302) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 302) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2024-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-16 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 2 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |