WV SB820 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require the Department of Human Services to create a program to improve quality of care rendered to the substance use disorder population by applying automatic enrollment.
Title
Requiring automatic enrollment of substance abuse disorder population into managed care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 647) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 300) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 300) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/14/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 647) |
2024-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | Do pass |
2024-02-29 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Tarr title amendment adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 300) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Weld amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Takubo amendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Finance on 2nd reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2024-02-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-16 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 5 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |