WV SB79 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-01-09 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on January 9 2008 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-01-09 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to subtract Social Security benefits from federal adjusted gross income to determine West Virginia adjusted gross income for purposes of personal income tax.
Title
Subtracting Social Security benefits from federal adjusted gross income
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Hunter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-01-09 | To Finance | |
2008-01-09 | To Finance | |
2008-01-09 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-09 | To Finance | |
2008-01-09 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Similar To) 2010-02-04 - To House Finance
HB3050 (Similar To) 2010-01-13 - To House Judiciary
HB4369 (Same As) 2010-02-05 - To House Judiciary
HB3050 (Similar To) 2010-01-13 - To House Judiciary
HB4369 (Same As) 2010-02-05 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=79&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |