WV SB785 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to add the Foster care ombudsman as a person to have access to records concerning a child or juvenile.
Title
Allowing Foster Care Ombudsman access to child protective records
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Laura Wakim Chapman [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Amy Nichole Grady [R] |
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 685) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 201) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 201) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-08 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 685) |
2024-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-08 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-08 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-03-06 | House | Immediate consideration |
2024-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 201) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-02-14 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 5 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |