WV SB785 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2008 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2008-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Summary
Establishing alcohol use by minor as juvenile delinquent offense
Title
Establishing alcohol use by minor as juvenile delinquent offense
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Barnes [R] | Sen. Donald Caruth [R] | Del. Frank Deem [R] | Sen. Mike Hall [R] |
Sen. Jon Hunter [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Del. Melvin Kessler [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. Randy White [D] | Sen. John Yoder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-27 | To House Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | To Judiciary | |
2008-02-27 | Introduced in House | |
2008-02-26 | Ordered to House | |
2008-02-26 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 36) | |
2008-02-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-02-26 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2008-02-22 | Read 1st time | |
2008-02-22 | On 1st reading | |
2008-02-22 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-02-22 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-02-22 | Reported do pass | |
2008-02-22 | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=785&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |